Flaherty, John William (CPSO#: 33353)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 13 Mar 1987

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Jul 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 1985
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 13 Mar 1987