Flaherty, Thomas Hugh (CPSO#: 23133)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Bristol, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients may contact Dr. Flaherty at 705-470-5461 to request a copy of their medical record.
Date Received: 01 Dec 2014


Instructions: Patients may contact Dr. Flaherty at 705-585-1959 to request a copy of their medical records.
Date Received: 08 Jun 2009

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2009