Flament, Martine France Claude (CPSO#: 78704)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Paris, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Flament Bisserbe Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 20 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: The Royal Ottawa Hospital 1145 Carling Avenue Ottawa, ON K1Z 7K4
Date Received: 23 Apr 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 2002
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 09 Apr 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015