Flavin, Michael Paul (CPSO#: 53253)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V6
Phone: (613) 548-6046
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Flavin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 23 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Flavin ( CPSO# 53253 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 06 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL PAUL FLAVIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FLAVIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1988