Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Fleischer, David Elliot (CPSO#: 69642)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 02 Sep 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Sep 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Vanderbilt University, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Oct 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Oct 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Oct 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Sep 1999