Fleming, Adam James (CPSO#: 84077)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Sep 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Sep 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Children's Hospital
Room 3A-72
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76720
Fax: (905) 521-1703
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Paediatric Haematology/Oncology Effective: 26 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADAM JAMES FLEMING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FLEMING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 06 Mar 2006 to 31 Mar 2006
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Haematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2014