Fleming, Fiona Lesley (CPSO#: 63867)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 26 Jan 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 Jan 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 10 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 May 1992
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 26 Jan 1996