Fleming, Ivor Mackenzie (CPSO#: 64183)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department Of Anaesthesia
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
19th floor
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-5270
Fax: (416) 586-8664
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

department of anesthesia
university health network
200 Elizabeth street
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

340 College Street, Suite 600
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Canada
Phone: (416) 498-2132
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ivor M. Fleming Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 29 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Fleming ( CPSO# 64183 )

Business Address:
600-340 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1X9
Phone Number: (416) 498-2132

Business Address:
Suite 3EN 464
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
19-104
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-5270

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist
Anesthesiology Effective: 15 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IVOR MACKENZIE FLEMING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FLEMING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1991