Fleming, Nathalie Ann (CPSO#: 69307)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital, Riverside Campus
7th Floor
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone: (613) 738-8400 Ext. 81739
Fax: (613) 738-8505
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ottawa Hospital, General Campus
Suite 855
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-8552
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Children's Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
Department Gynecology
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-2425
Fax: (613) 738-8505
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 31 Jul 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NATHALIE ANN FLEMING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FLEMING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Jul 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2000