Fleming, Russel Leroy (CPSO#: 23243)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care, 500 Church Street, Penetanguishene, ON, L9M 1G3
Date Received: 27 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 17 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016