Fleming, Sandford Rob (CPSO#: 24213)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 20 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1965
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Jun 1966
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Nov 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012