Fletcher, Barry Davis (CPSO#: 21131)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:McGill University, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 02 Dec 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 May 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Feb 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2001