Fletcher, David Mitchell (CPSO#: 60796)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
14 COLLEGE ST #203
Toronto ON  M5G 1K2
Phone: (416) 595-7075
Fax: (416) 595-5508
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

70 forest manor rd unit 5
Toronto ON  M2J 0A9
Canada
Phone: (416) 595-7075
Fax: (416) 595-5508
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 21 May 2015 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID MITCHELL FLETCHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FLETCHER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1992