Fletcher, Mark Andrew (CPSO#: 63787)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Jan 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Jan 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 1997 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1999 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jan 1997