Fletcher, Robert David (CPSO#: 29260)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Apr 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Apr 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Dec 2000 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Apr 2002