Fleuriau-Chateau, Philip Bryan (CPSO#: 66903)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German, Spanish

Education:University of Ottawa, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
595 Montreal Road
Suite 202
Ottawa ON  K1K 4L2
Phone: (613) 746-6745
Fax: (613) 746-6008
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Canada
Phone: (613) 746-4621 Ext. 4304
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fleuriau-Chateau Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Fleuriau-Chateau ( CPSO# 66903 )

Business Address:
202 - 595 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 4L2
Phone Number: (613) 744-6797

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHILIP BRYAN FLEURIAU-CHATEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FLEURIAU-CHATEAU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1998