Flint, Alastair John (CPSO#: 57426)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Auckland, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
8 Eaton North, Room 238
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4788
Fax: (416) 340-4198
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Australia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 17 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALASTAIR JOHN FLINT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FLINT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1988