Flood, Catherine Gwen (CPSO#: 63170)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 29 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jun 1999