Flood, Justin Roger (CPSO#: 81434)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Heath Sciences Centre
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-2301
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Abraham, Islam, McCallum, Mussari, Soboleski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 09 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Cheeseman ( CPSO# 59183 )
Dr. C. Abraham ( CPSO# 70151 )
Dr. P. Fenton ( CPSO# 54474 )
Dr. O. Islam ( CPSO# 69179 )
Dr. D. Jabs ( CPSO# 70253 )
Dr. J. Flood ( CPSO# 81434 )
Dr. A. McCallum ( CPSO# 63659 )
Dr. A. Menard ( CPSO# 79021 )
Dr. B. Mussari ( CPSO# 65429 )
Dr. J. Ricketts ( CPSO# 66593 )
Dr. E. Sauerbrei ( CPSO# 28818 )
Dr. C. Scott ( CPSO# 79597 )
Dr. I. Silver ( CPSO# 79178 )
Dr. D. Soboleski ( CPSO# 59427 )
Dr. D. Walker ( CPSO# 33831 )
Dr. A. Nasirzadeh ( CPSO# 93879 )
Dr. X. Wang ( CPSO# 86450 )
Dr. R. Butler ( CPSO# 86184 )
Dr. G. Dhillon ( CPSO# 84503 )
Dr. D. Rumbolt ( CPSO# 93048 )
Dr. D. Dabreo ( CPSO# 93188 )

Business Address:
776 Blackburn Mews East
Kingston ON  K7P 2N7
Phone Number: (613) 384-1220

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Business Address:
HDH
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Business Address:
SMOL 752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone Number: (613) 546-1101

Business Address:
835 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1G7
Phone Number: (613) 549-8775

Business Address:
191 Portsmouth Avenue
Kingston ON  K7M 8A6
Phone Number: (613) 548-4417


Corporation Name: Justin Flood Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Flood ( CPSO# 81434 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Radiation Oncology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-2301

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JUSTIN ROGER FLOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FLOOD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009