Flor-Henry, Sophie Ming Hui (CPSO#: 104455)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Psychiatry
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SOPHIE MING HUI FLOR-HENRY shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. FLOR-HENRY is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. FLOR-HENRY shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. FLOR-HENRY is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. FLOR-HENRY shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. FLOR-HENRY is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. FLOR-HENRY no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019