Florell, Randall Craig (CPSO#: 57280)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 May 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 May 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 04 Sep 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 6 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1996