Florence, Kenneth Louis (CPSO#: 62227)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 302
474 College Street
Toronto ON  M6G 1A4
Phone: (416) 531-5522
Fax: (416) 531-2577
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kenneth Florence Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 17 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Florence ( CPSO# 62227 )

Business Address:
302 - 474 College Street
Toronto ON  M6G 1A4
Phone Number: (416) 531-5522

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KENNETH LOUIS FLORENCE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FLORENCE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1990 to 14 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1991