Florence, Stephen Harvey (CPSO#: 52672)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Oct 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
12 RIDGEWOOD RD
Toronto ON  M5P 1T5
Phone: (416) 230-9760
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

4800 lesile street
Toronto ON  M2J 2K9
Canada
Phone: 416 493 1011
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

MY HEALTH MILTON DIAGNOSTIC IMAGING
480 BRONTE STEET SOUTH
Mississauga ON  L9T2X6
Canada
Phone: 9058788831
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

400 QUEEN STREET WEST
Brampton ON  L6X1B3
Canada
Phone: 9054543173
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

MYHealth Credit Valley Imaging
2300 Eglinton Avenue West,Suite G02
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Canada
Phone: (905) 828-0653
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stephen H. Florence Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Florence ( CPSO# 52672 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
The Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-4405

Business Address:
Suite G02
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone Number: (905) 828-0653

Business Address:
Suite 15
75 Main Street
Milton ON  L9T 2Y6
Phone Number: (905) 878-8831

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
Queensway Health Centre
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Phone Number: (416) 259-6671

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 02 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN HARVEY FLORENCE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FLORENCE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1983 to 14 Jun 1984
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 1984