Flores, Luis Antonio (CPSO#: 50814)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Dec 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad Central de Venezuela, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
4256 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6A4
Phone: (905) 374-7232
Fax: (905) 374-6602
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Luis Flores Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 03 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Flores ( CPSO# 50814 )

Business Address:
202 - 4256 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6A4
Phone Number: (905) 374-7232

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 18 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LUIS ANTONIO FLORES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FLORES is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 1986
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Dec 1986
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 11 Dec 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 1987
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 11 Dec 1988