Florindo, Tiffany Margaret (CPSO#: 97814)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
Family Medicine Teaching Unit
4001 Leslie St, 4 South
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6980
Fax: (416) 756-6979
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tiffany Florindo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 06 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Florindo ( CPSO# 97814 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
Family Medicine Teaching Unit
4001 Leslie Street, 4 South
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6980

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TIFFANY MARGARET FLORINDO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FLORINDO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 22 Sep 2014 to 14 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2014