Flowers, David John (CPSO#: 24918)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D.J. Flowers Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 21 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: c/o Dr. Ossama Fares Box 459 560 Albert Street Winchester ON K0C 2K0
Date Received: 26 May 2016

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016