Flowers, Edward Henry (CPSO#: 23008)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Feb 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Feb 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Edward H. Flowers Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 13 2012

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent S. Toronto, Ontario M3J 1Y6 Tel: (416) 398-0638 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 Fax: (416) 398-5932 Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 15 Mar 2012

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Feb 2012

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: February 3, 2012
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. Edward Henry Flowers to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”). (NOTE: this is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College’s Registration Department):

I, Dr. Edward H. Flowers:

(2) Acknowledge that I have given several Undertakings to the College, including on November 19, 2008, January 22, 2009 and March 17, 2010 (the “Previous Undertakings”).
(3) Hereby resign from the College effective immediately upon execution of this Undertaking.
(4) Understand and agree that upon execution of this Undertaking, this Undertaking shall replace all Previous Undertakings given to the College and that the Previous Undertakings will no longer be of any force or effect.
(5) Hereby undertake not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction after the Effective Date.
(6) Agree that in the event that the College should became aware that I have applied for a licence to practise medicine in any jurisdiction after the Effective Date, the College shall have the right to proceed with a disciplinary proceeding on the basis of a breach of this undertaking and, if successful, shall have the right to proceed with a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee.
(9) Undertake to the College that upon signing this Undertaking, I shall forward a request to the General Manager of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan (“OHIP”) that my billing number be deactivated for services rendered after the date I cease to practise.
(12) Consent to the terms of this undertaking being entered on the register as information that is available to the public.