Flowers, Michele Ann (CPSO#: 50564)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Wingham and District Hospital
270 Carling Terrace
Wingham ON  N0G 2W0
Phone: (519) 357-3210 Ext. 5238
Fax: (519) 357-1715
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELE ANN FLOWERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FLOWERS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1982 to 14 Jun 1983
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 4 - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1983