Flowitt, Catherine Jean (CPSO#: 50565)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 14 Jan 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1981 to 15 Jun 1982
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1983
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 20 Oct 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 14 Jan 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 14 Jan 2016 Active View Details [+]
            As from January 14, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Catherine Jean
            Flowitt, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Flowitt to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Flowitt has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in all
                  jurisdictions.