Flusk, David Victor (CPSO#: 88246)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 10 Jan 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Jan 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Dublin Trinity College, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 May 2008 to 05 Jun 2008
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 09 Feb 2009 to 05 Apr 2009
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 14 Dec 2010 to 10 Jan 2011
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 May 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Apr 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Jan 2011