Flynn, Christopher Andrew (CPSO#: 72638)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Apr 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Apr 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
2200 Eglington Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-2200 Ext. 3946
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Flynn Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 09 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Flynn ( CPSO# 72638 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER ANDREW FLYNN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FLYNN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2007