Flynn, James Joseph (CPSO#: 45206)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1980 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Apr 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 May 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jun 2013