Flynn, Kathleen Marie (CPSO#: 67818)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Student Health Services
Trent University
1600 West Bank Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7B8
Phone: (705) 748-1481
Fax: (705) 748-1055
Electoral District: 06

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHLEEN MARIE FLYNN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FLYNN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1996