Flynn, Leslie Vaughan (CPSO#: 58587)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Feb 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Feb 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hotel Dieu Hopital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 544-3400 Ext. 3522
Fax: 613 544-9666
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Flynn and Vanner Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Vanner ( CPSO# 52850 )
Dr. L. Flynn ( CPSO# 58587 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 09 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LESLIE VAUGHAN FLYNN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FLYNN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Sep 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 28 May 1994
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 29 May 1994 to 28 May 1995
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 29 May 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 1989