Flynn, Marie Dominique (CPSO#: 70284)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: Lawrence, Marie Dominique (used until: 15 Jul 2001 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
876 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 4L3
Phone: (613) 742-8182
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIE DOMINIQUE FLYNN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FLYNN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1998