Foda, Mohamed Mohamed Rashad (CPSO#: 64173)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Cairo, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 24 Aug 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 1997
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015