Foell, Kirsten Adrienne (CPSO#: 84354)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 206
1 Quarry Ridge
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone: (705) 728-2280 Ext. 4
Fax: (705) 728-0033
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Foell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 30 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Foell ( CPSO# 84354 )

Business Address:
Suite 206
1 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 728-2280

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIRSTEN ADRIENNE FOELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FOELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011