Foell, Robert Blaine Taylor (CPSO#: 69262)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Mar 2001

Summary

Former Name: Taylor, Robert Blaine (used until: 08 Mar 2001 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 1
3 Crescent Road
Huntsville ON  P1H 1Y3
Phone: (705) 789-6632
Fax: (705) 789-1922
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT BLAINE TAYLOR FOELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FOELL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2001