Foerster, Vivian Anne Victoria (CPSO#: 32881)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jul 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Jun 1991