Fogel, Evan Lloyd (CPSO#: 64092)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 11 Nov 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Nov 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 18 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Nov 1998