Fogel, Paula (CPSO#: 55285)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hebrew

Education:McGill University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2015