Foley, Francis John (CPSO#: 32043)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Oct 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Oct 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 6
3455 Garrard Road
Whitby ON  L1R 2N2
Phone: (905) 432-7977
Fax: (905) 432-8793
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Foley Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 9 2009

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1980 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRANCIS JOHN FOLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FOLEY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 1980