Foley, Jerome Brendan (CPSO#: 61564)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Saint James Hospital
Cardiology Department
James Street
Dublin 8
Ireland
Phone: 35314162639

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Ireland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEROME BRENDAN FOLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FOLEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Oct 1995
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 1989
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jun 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1995