Folkerson, Curtis Scott (CPSO#: 53575)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1982 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 1983 to 29 Feb 1984
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Feb 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2004