Follwell, Matthew John (CPSO#: 82786)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Mar 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Mar 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Simcoe Muskoka Regional
Cancer Program
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 728-9090 Ext. 43333
Fax: (705) 739-5619
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Matthew J. Follwell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 19 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Follwell ( CPSO# 82786 )

Business Address:
North Simcoe Muskoka Regional
Cancer Program
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 718-6341

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATTHEW JOHN FOLLWELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FOLLWELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 2013