Folman, Raphael (CPSO#: 21459)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 1968

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 21 Sep 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hebrew, Polish

Education:University of Toronto, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Centre
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: 905-848-7174
Electoral District: 05

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd. Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto, ON M9L 0A3 Tel: 1-800-775-0093 Fax: (647) 933 2904 Website: www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 03 Jan 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 07 Mar 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Aug 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 1973
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 01 Dec 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 01 Dec 2016 Active View Details [+]
            As  from  September 21, 2010, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation  on  the  certificate of registration held by Dr. Raphael Folman, in
            accordance with an undertaking  and  consent given by Dr. Folman to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Raphael Folman shall not work  in the Emergency Room and shall not do
                  any on call work at any hospital in which he has privileges.