Fong, Harmon (CPSO#: 95237)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Mar 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Mar 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oakville-Trafalgar Memorial
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 338-4618
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Harmon Fong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 10 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Fong ( CPSO# 95237 )

Business Address:
7030 Derry Road
Milton ON  L9T 7H6
Phone Number: (905) 878-2383

Business Address:
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 494-2120

Business Address:
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 338-4618

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 18 Oct 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HARMON FONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FONG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 2011 to 28 Jun 2011
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 04 Apr 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2012