Fong, Harvey Owen (CPSO#: 54765)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jan 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Renew Medical Clinics
1015 Cawthra Road
Methadone Practice
Mississauga ON  L5G 4K3
Phone: 905-271-1134
Fax: 905-271-1136
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

423 Colborne St E
NB: Methadone Practice
Brantford ON  N3S 3N5
Canada
Phone: (519) 756-1741
Fax: (519) 756-2017
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Harvey Fong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 26 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Fong ( CPSO# 54765 )

Business Address:
423 Colborne Street East
Brantford ON  N3S 3N5
Phone Number: (519) 756-1741

Business Address:
1015 Cawthra Street
Mississauga ON  L5G 1J7
Phone Number: (905) 271-1134

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HARVEY OWEN FONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FONG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Aug 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 1986