Fong, Ignatius Wellington (CPSO#: 42243)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 May 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Division Of Infectious Diseases
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5867
Fax: (416) 864-5310
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: I. W. Fong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Fong ( CPSO# 42243 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Division Of Infectious Disease
30 Bond Street
4C - North
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5867

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 19 Jan 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IGNATIUS WELLINGTON FONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FONG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 May 1993