Fong, Neil Andrew (CPSO#: 90314)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 May 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 May 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of the West Indies, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 24 Mar 2009 to 07 Apr 2009
PEAP - Resident - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 08 Apr 2009 to 19 Jun 2009
Elective Trainee - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2009